Docket for 18-7651 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 19 2018 | Application (18A568) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2018 to February 9, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 30 2018 | Application (18A568) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 9, 2019. | | | Jan 25 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 28, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Feb 27 2019 | Brief of California in opposition not accepted for filing. (February 27, 2019) (Corrected electronic filing submitted) | | | Feb 27 2019 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 14 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019. | | | Apr 01 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|