SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7637 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7637 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Fidencio Valdez, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
January 29, 2019
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-85,941-02)
Decision Date:
October 3, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 28, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 26 2019
Brief of respondent The State of Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 11 2019
Reply of petitioner Fidencio Valdez filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Mar 14 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 01 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. Schulman
Counsel of Record
1801 East 51st Street
Suite 365-474
Austin, TX 78723
zdrdavida@davidschulman.com
512-474-4747
Party name: Fidencio Valdez
Attorneys for Respondent
Lily Maria Stroud
Counsel of Record
El Paso District Attorney's Office
500 E. San Antonio Ave., Suite 201
El Paso, TX 79901
lstroud@epcounty.com
9155462059
Party name: The State of Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##