SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7503 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7503 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Abdur Rahim Ambrose, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:
January 18, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Mississippi
Case Numbers:
(2015-DP-01159-SCT)
Decision Date:
August 2, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
October 18, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 19, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 06 2019
Brief amicus curiae of The Roman Catholic Diocese of Biloxi, Mississippi filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 19 2019
Brief of respondent State of Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 26 2019
Reply of petitioner Abdur Rahim Ambrose filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 07 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 25 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alison Steiner
Counsel of Record
Office of Capital Defense Counsel
239 N. Lamar St.
Suite 604
Jackson, MS 39201
astei@ospd.ms.gov
601-576-2314
Party name: Abdur Rahim Ambrose
Attorneys for Respondent
LaDonna Curtis Holland
Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205
lholl@ago.state.ms.us
6013593827
Party name: State of Mississippi
Other
Christian Janet Strickland
Counsel of Record
Schwartz, Orgler & Jordan, PLLC
2355 Pass Road
Biloxi, MS 39531
christian@sojlaw.net
228-388-7441
Party name: THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF BILOXI, MISSISSIPPI
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##