Nov 20 2018 | Application (18A544) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 6, 2018 to February 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Nov 25 2018 | Application (18A544) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 4, 2019. |
| |
Jan 14 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 19, 2019) |
| PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 15 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2019. |
| |
Mar 11 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2019. |
| |
May 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2019 to June 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 10, 2019. |
| |
Jun 10 2019 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Jun 25 2019 | Reply of petitioner Jurijus Kadamovas filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
| |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |