SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7457 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7457 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Charles Edward Case, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
January 16, 2019
Linked with 18A478
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S057156)
Decision Date:
May 31, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
August 15, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2018
Application (18A478) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2018 to January 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Nov 05 2018
Application (18A478) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 12, 2019.
Jan 11 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 11 2019
Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Feb 28 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robin Lou Kallman
Counsel of Record
Office of the State Public Defender of California
1111 Broadway, Suite 1000
Oakland, CA 94607
robin.kallman@ospd.ca.gov
5102673300
Party name: Charles Edward Case
Attorneys for Respondent
Caely Erin Fallini
Counsel of Record
Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
1300 I Street, Suite 125 / P.O. Box 944255
Sacramento, CA 95814
caely.fallini@doj.ca.gov
916-210-7765
Party name: State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##