SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7442 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7442 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Kevin Underwood, Petitioner
v.
Mike Carpenter, Warden
Docketed:
January 16, 2019
Linked with 18A479
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-6262)
Decision Date:
July 2, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
August 17, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2018
Application (18A479) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 15, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 05 2018
Application (18A479) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 14, 2019.
Jan 14 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 13 2019
Brief of respondent Mike Carpenter in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 21 2019
Reply of petitioner Kevin Underwood filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 28 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Mary Jernigan McGovern
Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender for the Westem District of Oklahoma
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
sarah_jernigan@fd.org
4056095995
Party name: Kevin Underwood
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer J. Dickson
Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General
2300 N. Lincoln Blvd.
Suite 112
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Mike Carpenter
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##