Docket for 18-7431 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 08 2018 | Application (18A521) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 22, 2018 to January 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 20 2018 | Application (18A521) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 11, 2019. | | | Jan 11 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 14, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2019 to March 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 15, 2019. | | | Mar 15 2019 | Brief of respondent Davis, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Apr 03 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019. | | | Apr 22 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|