Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-728
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-728
Title:Jacobus Rentmeester, Petitioner
v.
Nike, Inc.
Docketed:December 7, 2018
Linked with 18A328
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35509)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 6, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2018Application (18A328) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 4, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 03 2018Application (18A328) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 3, 2018.
Dec 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2019 to February 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 6, 2019.
Jan 02 2019Amicus brief of National Press Photographers Association not accepted for filing. (January 03, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Jan 02 2019Brief amici curiae of The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Digital Justice Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Terry S. Kogan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Jacobus Rentmeester
Attorneys for Respondent
Dale M. Cendali
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
44th Floor
New York, NY 10022

dale.cendali@kirkland.com
212-446-4846
Party name: Nike, Inc.
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Digital Justice Foundation
Mickey H. Osterreicher
    Counsel of Record
National Press Photographers Association
120 Hooper Street
Athens, GA 30602

lawyer@nppa.org
716-983-7800
Party name: The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and The National Press Photographers Association
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2023267921
Party name: Professor Terry S. Kogan

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543