Docket for 18-7118 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 17 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 18, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 16 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2019 to January 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 23, 2019. | | | Jan 23 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 07 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019. | | | Feb 25 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|