SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-703
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-703
Title:
University of Southern California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Allen L. Munro, et al.
Docketed:
November 29, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-55550)
Decision Date:
July 24, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
August 31, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 29 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 31, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 31 2018
Brief of respondents Allen Munro, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 02 2019
Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 15 2019
Reply of petitioners University of Southern California, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 16 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eugene Scalia
Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036
escalia@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8206
Party name: University of Southern California, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Armin Wolff
Counsel of Record
Schlichter Bogard & Denton LLP
100 South Street, Ste. 1200
Saint Louis, MO 63102
mwolff@uselaws.com
3146216115
Party name: Allen Munro, et al.
Other
John Desire Giansello III
Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019
jgiansello@orrick.com
212-506-5217
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##