SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6902 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6902 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Scott Mansfield, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
December 3, 2018
Linked with 18A181
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-690)
Decision Date:
July 5, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2018
Application (18A181) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 3, 2018 to December 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Aug 21 2018
Application (18A181) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 2, 2018.
Nov 29 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Appendix
Dec 28 2018
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 09 2019
Reply of petitioner Scott Mansfield filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 17 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James L. Driscoll Jr.
Counsel of Record
Law Office of the Capital Collateral CounselMidd
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637
driscoll@ccmr.state.fl.us
8135581600
Party name: Scott Mansfield
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##