Aug 20 2018 | Application (18A192) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 26, 2018 to November 25, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Aug 22 2018 | Application (18A192) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 25, 2018. |
| |
Nov 26 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 31, 2018) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Dec 13 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 31, 2018 to January 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 14 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 31, 2019. |
| |
Jan 31 2019 | Brief of respondent North Carolina in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 12 2019 | Reply of petitioner Mario Andrette McNeill filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 14 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019. |
| |
Mar 04 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |