Sep 24 2018 | Application (18A322) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 4, 2018 to November 19, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Sep 27 2018 | Application (18A322) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 19, 2018. |
| |
Nov 19 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 26, 2018) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Dec 18 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2019. |
| |
Jan 15 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2019 to February 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 16 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 25, 2019. |
| |
Feb 19 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2019 to March 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 22 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended further to and including March 27, 2019. |
| |
Mar 19 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2019 to April 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 26, 2019. |
| |
Apr 26 2019 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Certificate of Word CountMain Document |
May 14 2019 | Reply of petitioner Carlos Caro filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 15 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019. |
| |
Jun 03 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |