SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6766 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6766 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
David Gulbrandson, Petitioner
v.
Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections
Docketed:
November 21, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-15829)
Decision Date:
August 15, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Dec 21 2018
Brief of respondents Charles L. Ryan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 10 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 10 2019
Reply of petitioner David Gulbrandson filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 19 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy M. Gabrielsen
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
407 W. Congress, Ste. 501
Suite 501
Tucson, AZ 85701
tim_gabrielsen@fd.org
520-879-7614
Party name: David Gulbrandson
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Stuart Reilly
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005
Phoenix, AZ 85007
Andrew.Reilly@azag.gov
6025428573
Party name: Charles L. Ryan, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##