Docket for 18-6727 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 14 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 19, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendix | Dec 28 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 19, 2018 to January 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 28 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 18, 2019. | | | Jan 18 2019 | Brief of respondent Tim Shoop in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 07 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019. | | | Feb 25 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|