Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-663
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-663
Title:Fredric Russell Mance, Jr., et al., Petitioners
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:November 21, 2018
Linked with 18A179
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-10311)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2018Application (18A179) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Application (18A179) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 19, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2018 to January 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2019.
Dec 20 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of The Madison Society Foundation, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2019 to February 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Jan 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2019.
Feb 21 2019Brief of respondents William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 11 2019Reply of petitioners Fredric Mance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Mar 27 2019Rescheduled.
Apr 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Fredric Mance, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General, et al.
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: THE STATES OF TEXAS, ALABAMA, ALASKA, ARKANSAS, GEORGIA, IDAHO, KANSAS, LOUISIANA, MICHIGAN, MISSISSIPPI, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTH DAKOTA, UTAH, WEST VIRGINIA, AND WYOMING
Donald E. J. Kilmer Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Donald Kilmer
1645 Willow Street
Suite 150
San Jose, CA 95125

don@dklawoffice.com
(408) 348-6068
Party name: THE MADISON SOCIETY FOUNDATION, INC., THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., AND FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Professors of Second Amendment Law, Independence Institute, and Millennial Policy Center
Michael Lyn Rice
    Counsel of Record
Harrison Law LLC
1 N. LaSalle Street
Suite 2001
Chicago, IL 60602

mikerice@hlawllc.com
312-638-8781
Party name: The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543