Docket for 18-6588 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 05 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 6, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Nov 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2018 to January 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 27 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 7, 2019. | | | Jan 07 2019 | Brief of respondent Edward Thomas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 24 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019. | | | Feb 19 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|