Docket for 18-6344 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 14 2018 | Application (18A173) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2018 to October 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main Document | Aug 16 2018 | Application (18A173) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until October 14, 2018. | | | Oct 12 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 15, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | Nov 15 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Arkansas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019. | | | Jan 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|