Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6315 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6315 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:David Ivy, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:October 16, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Western Division
   Case Numbers:(W2016-02454-CCA-R3-ECN)
   Decision Date:January 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 18, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 15, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetition
Nov 15 2018Brief of respondent State of Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Nov 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelley Jane Henry
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Middle District of Tennessee
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

kelley_henry@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: David Ivy
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Craig Coulam
    Counsel of Record
State of Tennessee Attorney General's Office
301 6th Avenue North; P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207

andrew.coulam@ag.tn.gov
6157411868
Party name: State of Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543