SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6309 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6309 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Warren Justin Hardy, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
October 12, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S113421)
Decision Date:
May 31, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
July 18, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 02 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2018 to December 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2018.
Dec 13 2018
Brief of respondent People of the State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 27 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Susan Kathryn Shaler
Counsel of Record
Susan K. Shaler Professional Law Corporation
991 Lomas Santa Fe Dr.
Suite C, #112
Solana Beach, CA 92075
shalerlawcorp@gmail.com
8582596737
Party name: Warren Hardy
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan ames Kline
Counsel of Record
Office of the California Attorney General
300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702
Los Angeles, CA 90013
jonathan.kline@doj.ca.gov
(213) 269-6029
Party name: People of the State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##