Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6162
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6162
Title:Lyanne Lemeunier-Fitzgerald, Petitioner
v.
Maine
Docketed:October 2, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Maine
   Case Numbers:(Ken-16-503)
   Decision Date:July 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 1, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Oct 31 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Maine to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 16 2018Response Requested. (Due December 17, 2018)
Dec 14 2018Brief of State of Maine in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jamesa J. Drake
    Counsel of Record
Drake Law LLC
P.O. Box 56
Auburn, ME 04212

Jamesa_Drake@hotmail.com
207-330-5105
Party name: Lyanne Lemeunier-Fitzgerald
Attorneys for Respondent
Donald William Macomber
    Counsel of Record
Maine Department of Atty. Gen.
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333-0006

donald.w.macomber@maine.gov
2076268507
Party name: State of Maine

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543