SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6062 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6062 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ramiro Rubi Ibarra, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:
September 20, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-70014)
Decision Date:
June 19, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 22, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 05 2018
Order entered extending the time to file a response to the petition to and including January 7, 2019.
Dec 19 2018
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 03 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 22 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Naomi Terr
Counsel of Record
Kuykendall and Associates
P.O. Box 19252
Houston, TX 77224
naomiterr@kuykendall-law.com
7134713943
Party name: Ramiro Ibarra
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Matthew Hoffman
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711
stephen.hoffman@oag.texas.gov
5129366388
Party name: Lorie Davis
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##