Docket for 18-5980 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 23 2018 | Application (18A102) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 13, 2018 to September 29, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jul 27 2018 | Application (18A102) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 12, 2018. | | | Sep 11 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 15, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Oct 09 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2018 to November 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 15, 2018. | | | Nov 15 2018 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Nov 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019. | | | Jan 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|