Docket for 18-5796 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 11 2018 | Application (17A1370) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 24, 2018 to August 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jun 15 2018 | Application (17A1370) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 23, 2018. | | | Aug 23 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 27, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 10 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 27, 2018 to October 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 14 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 26, 2018. | | | Oct 26 2018 | Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Nov 09 2018 | Reply of petitioner Ray Jefferson Cromartie filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 14 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018. | | | Dec 03 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|