SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5738 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5738 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Bill Paul Marquardt, Petitioner
v.
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:
August 24, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-11029)
Decision Date:
December 28, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
March 29, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 24, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Sep 24 2018
Brief of respondents Julie Jones, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 08 2018
Notice of state court appointed counsel Julissa R. Fontan, Esq. received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Oct 11 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kara Renee Ottervanger
Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel - Middle Region
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637
ottervanger@ccmr.state.fl.us
813-558-1600
Party name: Bill P. Marquardt
Bill Paul Marquardt
Sumter County Jail
219 E. Anderson Ave.
Bushnell, FL 33513
Party name: Bill P. Marquardt
Attorneys for Respondents
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: Julie Jones, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##