Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-555
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-555
Title:Marquette County Road Commission, Petitioner
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:October 29, 2018
Linked with 18A129
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1154)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2018Application (18A129) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 27, 2018 to October 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 03 2018Application (18A129) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 25, 2018.
Oct 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Marquette County Road Commission.
Blanket Consent
Nov 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2018 to December 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 28, 2018.
Nov 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018Brief amici curiae of County Road Association of Michigan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2018 to January 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 28, 2019.
Jan 28 2019Brief of respondents Environmental Protection Agency, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Reply of petitioner Marquette County Road Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 04 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Miller
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Blvd.
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

mmiller@pacificlegal.org
5616915000
Party name: Marquette County Road Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
1121 L Street, Suite 700
Sacramento, CA 95814

paul.beard@alston.com
9164983354
Party name: County Road Association of Michigan and Stand U.P.
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and Mackinac Center for Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543