SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5396 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5396 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Calvin McMillan, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:
July 30, 2018
Linked with 17A1217
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(CR-14-0935)
Decision Date:
August 11, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
February 23, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 02 2018
Application (17A1217) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2018 to July 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
May 08 2018
Application (17A1217) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 23, 2018.
Jul 19 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 29, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 14 2018
Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 23 2018
Reply of petitioner Calvin McMillan filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 30 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 20 2018
Letter of September 20, 2018 from counsel for petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Mark Mulvaney
Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
83 Poplar Street, NW
Atlanta, GA 30303
pmulvaney@schr.org
4046881202
Party name: Calvin McMillan
Attorneys for Respondent
James Roy Houts
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 300152
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152
jhouts@ago.state.al.us
3342427300
Party name: State of Alabama
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##