Docket for 18-5376 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 01 2018 | Application (17A1228) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 29, 2018 to July 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOther | May 15 2018 | Application (17A1228) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 28, 2018. | | | Jul 17 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 27, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Aug 27 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018. | | | Oct 09 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|