Docket for 18-5375 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 02 2018 | Application (17A1256) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2018 to June 29, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | May 15 2018 | Application (17A1256) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 29, 2018. | | | Jun 29 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 27, 2018) | | Petition | Aug 23 2018 | Brief of respondent People of the State of California in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 06 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|