SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5359 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5359 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ernest D. Suggs, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
July 26, 2018
Linked with 17A1344
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC16-576)
Decision Date:
November 9, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
March 13, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 30 2018
Application (17A1344) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 11, 2018 to July 26, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jun 06 2018
Application (17A1344) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 26, 2018.
Jul 25 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 27, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Aug 27 2018
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Sep 06 2018
Reply of petitioner Ernest Suggs filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Sep 13 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Friedman
Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel-Northern Region
1004 DeSoto Park Drive
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Robert.Friedman@ccrc-north.org
850-487-0922
Party name: Ernest Suggs
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##