Docket for 18-5331 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 20 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 23, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Aug 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Aug 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 21, 2018. | | | Sep 18 2018 | Brief of respondent The State of Nevada in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 04 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018. | | | Oct 29 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|