SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5278 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5278 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Christopher Collings, Petitioner
v.
Missouri
Docketed:
July 19, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Missouri
Case Numbers:
(SC96118)
Decision Date:
March 6, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
April 17, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 16 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 20, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Aug 20 2018
Brief of respondent Missouri in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Sep 04 2018
Reply of petitioner Christopher Collings filed. Distributed
Main Document
Proof of Service
Sep 06 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amy Marie Bartholow
Counsel of Record
Missouri State Public Defender System
1000 West Nifong Boulevard
Building 7, Suite 100
Columbia, MO 65203
amy.bartholow@mspd.mo.gov
573-777-9977
Party name: Christopher Collings
Attorneys for Respondent
Shaun J. Mackelprang
Counsel of Record
Missouri Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102
shaun.mackelprang@ago.mo.gov
(573) 751-0272
Party name: Missouri
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##