SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5240
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5240
Title:
Roy Lee Ward, Petitioner
v.
Robert E. Carter, Jr., Commissioner, Indiana Department of Correction, et al.
Docketed:
July 17, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Indiana
Case Numbers:
(46S03-1709-PL-00569)
Decision Date:
February 13, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
April 23, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Aug 03 2018
Waiver of right of respondents Robert Carter, Jr., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 23 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Wesley Frank
Counsel of Record
Christopher C . Myers & Associates
809 South Calhoun Street, Suite 400
Fort Wayne, IN 46802
dfrank@myers-law.com
2604240600
Party name: Roy Ward
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen Richard Creason
Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
302 West Washington St., 5th Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46204
steve.creason@atg.in.gov
317-232-6201
Party name: Robert Carter, Jr., et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##