Docket for 18-5122 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 18 2018 | Application (17A1161) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 3, 2018 to July 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service | Apr 23 2018 | Application (17A1161) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 2, 2018. | | | Jul 02 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 6, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 27 2018 | Brief of respondent state of florida in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Aug 16 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|