Docket for 18-5103 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 19 2018 | Application (17A1173) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 3, 2018 to July 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Apr 26 2018 | Application (17A1173) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 2, 2018. | | | Jun 29 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 2, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOtherProof of Service | Jul 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 2, 2018 to September 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 24 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2018. | | | Aug 13 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 24 2018 | Reply of petitioner Jeffery Day Rieber filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 30 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|