Docket for 18-5078 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 17 2018 | Application (17A1157) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 30, 2018 to June 29, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Apr 23 2018 | Application (17A1157) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 29, 2018. | | | Jun 28 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 2, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 16 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 02 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|