Docket for 18-5039 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 27 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 30, 2018) | | PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendix | Jul 03 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 30, 2018 to August 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 06 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 29, 2018 | | | Aug 28 2018 | Brief of respondent Chappell, Kevin in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Sep 07 2018 | Reply of petitioner Guy Rowland filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018. | | | Oct 09 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|