SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5012 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5012 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ian Deco Lightbourne, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
June 28, 2018
Linked with 17A1133
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-837)
Decision Date:
January 26, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2018
Application (17A1133) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 26, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Apr 20 2018
Application (17A1133) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 25, 2018.
Jun 22 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 30, 2018)
Petition
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 30 2018
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Main Document
Aug 13 2018
Reply of petitioner Ian Deco Lightbourne filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 16 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Suzanne Myers Keffer
Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel - South
1 E. Broward Boulevard
Suite 444
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
keffers@ccsr.state.fl.us
954-713-1284
Party name: Ian Deco Lightbourne
Attorneys for Respondent
Doris Meacham
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
444 Seabreeze., 5TH FLOOR
Daytona Beach, FL 32118
doris.meacham@myfloridalegal.com
3862384990
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##