Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-485
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-485
Title:Edward G. McDonough, Petitioner
v.
Youel Smith, Individually and as Special District Attorney for the County of Rensselaer, New York, aka Trey Smith
Docketed:October 16, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-296)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2018.
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Criminal Defense Organizations, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Institute of Harvard Law School filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 07 2018Brief of respondent Youel Smith in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 18 2018Reply of petitioner Edward G. McDonough filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 17, 2019
Feb 25 2019Brief of petitioner Edward G. McDonough filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Edward G. McDonough.
Blanket Consent
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Institute of Harvard Law School filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Criminal Defense Organizations, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law at NYU School of Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Federal Court Scholars, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of St. Thomas More Lawyers Guild of Rochester, New York filed.
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Network filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Mar 27 2019Brief of respondent Youel Smith filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 03 2019Record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of New York is electronic.
Apr 03 2019Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Motion of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Motion of St. Thomas More Lawyers Guild of Rochester, New York for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Motion of Indiana, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Reply of petitioner Edward G. McDonough filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 12 2019Motion of Indiana, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Apr 12 2019Motion of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Apr 12 2019Motion of St. Thomas More Lawyers Guild of Rochester, New York for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Apr 17 2019Argued. For petitioner: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Thomas J. O'Connor, Albany, N. Y.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5600
Party name: Edward G. McDonough
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas James O'Connor
    Counsel of Record
Napierski, VanDenburgh, Napierski & O'Connor, LLP
296 Washington Avenue Extension, Suite 3
Albany, NY 12203

toc@nvnolaw.com
5188629292
Party name: Youel Smith
Other
Geoffrey Paul Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

geaton@winston.com
202-282-5705
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, National League of Cities, and U.S. Conference of Mayors
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Indiana, Arkansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Ohio, South Carolina and Texas
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Robert Stanton Jones
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

stanton.jones@apks.com
202-942-5855
Party name: Criminal Defense Organizations, Civil Rights Organizations, and the Cato Institute
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
202-499-4232
Party name: Cause of Action Institute
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Benjamin Gruenstein
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

bgruenstein@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: THE INNOCENCE NETWORK
Jonathan Loevy
    Counsel of Record
Loevy and Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen
3rd FL
Chicago, IL 60607

jon@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: Federal Court Scholars, Leah Litman, James Pfander, Suzanna Sherry, Amanda Tyler, and Stephen Vladeck
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law at NYU School of Law, et al.
John M. Regan Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law office of John M. Regan, Jr.
1100 University Ave., Suite 209
Rochester, NY 14607

strikelawyer@gmail.com
585-568-9553
Party name: St. Thomas More Lawyers Guild of Rochester, New York
Ronald S. Sullivan Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Institute of Harvard Law School
6 Everett Street, Suite 516
Cambridge, MA 02138

rsullivan@law.harvard.edu
617-496-8143
Party name: Criminal Justice Institute of Harvard Law School

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543