Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-47
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-47
Title:Thomas McClary, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commodores Entertainment Corp.
Docketed:July 9, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15794)
   Decision Date:January 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 8, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 08 2018Brief of respondent Commodores Entertainment Corp. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kevin J. Mirch
    Counsel of Record
Mirch Law Firm LLP
750 B Street
Suite 2500
San Diego, CA 92101

kevinmirch@mirchlaw.com
6195016220
Party name: Thomas McClary, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lindsay Patrick Lopez
    Counsel of Record
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis, P.A.
101 E. Kennedy Blvd, Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

llopez@trenam.com
813-223-7474
Party name: Commodores Entertainment Corp.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543