Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-457
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-457
Title:North Carolina Department of Revenue, Petitioner
v.
The Kimberley Rice Kaestner 1992 Family Trust
Docketed:October 11, 2018
Linked with 18A210
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(307PA15-2)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2018Application (18A210) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 6, 2018 to October 9, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Aug 24 2018Application (18A210) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 9, 2018.
Oct 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Waiver of right of respondent The Kimberley Rice Kaestner 1992 Family Trust to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Oct 31 2018Response Requested. (Due November 30, 2018)
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondent Kimberley Rice Kaestner 1992 Family Trust in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2018Reply of petitioner North Carolina Department of Revenue filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 04 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, North Carolina Department of Revenue.
Blanket Consent
Feb 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, The Kimberley Rice Kaestner 1992 Family Trust.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 16, 2019

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew W. Sawchak
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Dept. of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

msawchak@ncdoj.gov
(919) 716-6429
Party name: NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Attorneys for Respondent
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: The Kimberley Rice Kaestner 1992 Family Trust
Thomas Dean MyrickMoore & Van Allen PLLC
100 North Tryon Street, Floor 47
Charlotte, NC 28202

tommyrick@mvalaw.com
704-331-1126
Party name: The Kimberley Rice Kaestner 1992 Family Trust

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543