Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-443 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-443 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Bobby James Moore, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:October 9, 2018
Linked with 18A163
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-13,374-05)
   Decision Date:June 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2018Application (18A163) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 4, 2018 to November 3, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Application (18A163) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 4, 2018.
Oct 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018Motion For Leave to Intervene as a respondent filed by Attorney General of Texas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 08 2018Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Donald B. Ayer, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Reply of petitioner Bobby James Moore filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 19 2018Response to motion from petitioner Bobby James Moore filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

cliff.sloan@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Bobby James Moore
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Anthony Durfee
    Counsel of Record
District Attorney's Office
500 Jefferson
Suite 600
Houston, TX 77002-1901

durfee_scott@dao.hctx.net
713-274-5800
Party name: Texas
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jamunson@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: American Psychological Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Academy of Psychiatry and the Law, National Association of Social Workers, and National Association of Social Workers Texas Chapter
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
Corette Pohlman, et al.
129 W. Park
Butte, MT 59701

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Meir Feder
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281

mfeder@jonesday.com
2123263939
Party name: Donald B. Ayer, Bob Barr, Mark L. Earley Sr., David A. Keene, Kenneth W. Starr, Larry D. Thompson, Richard A. Viguerie, and the Constitution Project
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Attorney General of Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543