Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-404
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-404
Title:The Colorado Independent, Petitioner
v.
District Court for the Eighteenth Judicial District of Colorado, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(18SA19)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 17 2018Waiver of right of respondent District Court for the Eighteenth Judicial District of Colorado to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Oct 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Law and Journalism filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Nine Colorado Media Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 47 Media Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Brief of respondent Sir Mario Owens in support filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Sir Mario Owens.
Main Document
Nov 01 2018Response Requested. (Due December 3, 2018)
Nov 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 3, 2018 to February 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2019.
Jan 10 2019Brief of respondent District Court for the Eighteenth Judicial District of Colorado in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2019Motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix under seal filed by respondent.
Jan 14 2019Response to motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix under seal from petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Reply of petitioner The Colorado Independent filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Motion of respondent for leave to file a supplemental appendix under seal GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. Schulz
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1675 Broadway, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019

schulzd@ballardspahr.com
212-850-6103
Party name: The Colorado Independent
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan Dickon Reppucci
    Counsel of Record
Reppucci Law Firm, P.C.
1544 Race St.
Denver, CO 80206

jiccupper@gmail.com
303-333-5166
Party name: Sir Mario Owens
Grant Thomas Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Department of Law
Office of the Attorney General, 1300 Broadway 6th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

grant.sullivan@coag.gov
720.508.6349
Party name: District Court for the Eighteenth Judicial District of Colorado
Other
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th St. NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 47 Media Organizations
Alan Keith Chen
    Counsel of Record
University of Denver Sturm College of Law
2255 East Evans Avenue
Room 455#
Denver, CO 80208

achen@law.du.edu
303-871-6283
Party name: Scholars of Law and Journalism
Gregg P. Leslie
    Counsel of Record
ASU Sandra Day O'Connor College of Law
111 E. Taylor St.
Rm. 578
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Gregg.Leslie@asu.edu
480-727-7398
Party name: Nine Colorado Media Organizations
Charles Stephen Sims
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 208215
New Haven, CT 06520

CSims@proskauer.com
917-612-6575
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543