Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-377
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-377
Title:Montanans for Community Development, Petitioner
v.
Jeffrey A. Mangan, et al.
Docketed:September 24, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35997)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Waiver of right of respondents Jeffrey A. Mangan, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Institute for Free Speech, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 08 2018Response Requested. (Due December 10, 2018)
Nov 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2018 to January 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 9, 2019.
Jan 09 2019Brief of respondents Jeffrey A. Mangan, et al. in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2019Reply of petitioner Montanans for Community Development filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: Montanans for Community Development
Attorneys for Respondents
Dale Michael Schowengerdt
    Counsel of Record
Montana Department of Justice
215 N. Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

dales@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: Jeffrey A. Mangan, et al.
Matthew Thompson CochenourState of Montana - Department of Justice Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders; PO Box 201401
Helena, MT 59601

mcochenour2@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: Jeffrey A. Mangan, et al.
Other
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech and the Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543