Mar 05 2018 | Application (17A965) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 19, 2018 to April 18, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentOther |
Mar 13 2018 | Application (17A965) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 18, 2018. |
| |
Apr 17 2018 | Application (17A965) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 25, 2018. |
| |
Apr 17 2018 | Application (17A965) to extend further the time from April 18, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Written Request |
Apr 25 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2018) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jul 24 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 6, 2018 to September 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jul 30 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 5, 2018. |
| |
Sep 05 2018 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Roderick A. Johnson. |
| Main Document |
Sep 05 2018 | Brief of respondent Roderick A. Johnson in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Sep 19 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018. |
| |
Oct 05 2018 | Reply of petitioner Pennsylvania filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 09 2018 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
| |
Oct 09 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
| |