SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-34 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-34 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Pablo San Martin, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
July 5, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-1778)
Decision Date:
February 28, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 29 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Aug 02 2018
Brief of The State of Florida in opposition not accepted for filing. (August 16, 2018) To Be Reprinted
Aug 02 2018
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. (8/16/2018)
Certificate of Word Count
Other
Proof of Service
Main Document
Aug 22 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gustavo Jesus Garcia-Montes
Counsel of Record
Gustavo J. Garcia-Montes, PA
2333 Brickell Ave., Suite A-1
Miami, FL 33129
ggm@agmlawgroup.com
3056662880
Party name: Pablo San Martin
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Andrew Browne
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607-7013
Scott.Browne@MyFloridaLegal.com
813-287-7910
Party name: The State of Florida
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##