Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-318
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-318
Title:Christos Koutentis, Petitioner
v.
New York City Police Department, Licensing Division
Docketed:September 12, 2018
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, First Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(5753)
   Decision Date:February 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 12, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2018Waiver of right of respondent N.Y.C. POLICE DEPARTMENT, LICENSING DIVISION to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bernard Kleinman
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Bernard V. Kleinman, PLLC
108 VILLAGE SQUARE
Suite 313
Somers, NY 10589-2305

ATTRNYLWYR@YAHOO.COM
914.644.6660
Party name: CHRISTOS KOUTENTIS
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathy Chang Park
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Corporation Counsel
New York City Law Department
100 Church St.
New York, NY 10007

kpark@law.nyc.gov
(212) 356-0855
Party name: N.Y.C. POLICE DEPARTMENT, LICENSING DIVISION

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543