Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-315
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-315
Title:Cochise Consultancy, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Linked with 17A1390
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-12836)
   Decision Date:April 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2018Application (17A1390) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2018 to September 8, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 28 2018Application (17A1390) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 8, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Oct 04 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt.
Blanket Consent
Oct 11 2018Response to petition from respondent United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Reply of petitioners Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 16 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jan 02 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 02 2019Brief of petitioner Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt
Blanket Consent
Jan 03 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Jan 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Joel D. Hesch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Government Procurement filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Brief amici curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar, and the Professional Services Counsel-The Voice of the Government Services Industry filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 19, 2019
Feb 01 2019Brief of respondent United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Feb 08 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Indiana and 19 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Whistleblower Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Feb 25 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 28 2019The record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER. The record is complete.
Mar 04 2019Reply of petitioner Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2019Argued. For petitioners: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., Los Angeles, Cal. For respondent: Earl N. Mayfield, III, Fairfax, Va.; and Matthew Guarnieri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
May 13 2019Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Earl Neville Mayfield III
    Counsel of Record
Juris Day, PLLC
10521 Judicial Drive, Suite 200
Fairfax, VA 22030

tmayfield@jurisday.com
708-268-5600
Party name: United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt
Other
Jonathan Goldman Cedarbaum
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jonathan.cedarbaum@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6315
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Jonathan Goldman Cedarbaum
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jonathan.cedarbaum@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Stephen M. Kohn
    Counsel of Record
Kohn, Kohn and Colapinto, LLP
3233 P Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20007

sk@kkc.com
(202) 342-6980
Party name: The National Whistleblower Center
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Zach Chaffee-McClure
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
2555 Grand Blvd
Kansas City, MO 64108

zmcclure@shb.com
816-559-2404
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar and the Professional Services Counsel-The Voice of the Government Services Industry
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana and 19 Other States
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Dan Himmelfarb
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Coalition for Government Procurement
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543