Docket for 18-290
|
Aug 10 2018 | Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due October 9, 2018) | | Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 18 2018 | Waiver of right of appellees Governor Jay Inslee, Attorney General Robert Ferguson, Secretary of State Kim Wyman, Washington State House of Representatives, Washington State Senate to respond filed. | | Main Document | Sep 21 2018 | Waiver of right of appellees Texas Govenor Greg Abbott, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Sep 28 2018 | Waiver of right of appellees Bruce Rauner, Lisa Madigan, Steve Sandvoss, Illinois State Senate, Illinois State House of Representatives to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 09 2018 | Waiver of right of appellees U.S. House of Representatives, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 17 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018. | | | Nov 05 2018 | The appeal is dismissed for want of jurisdiction. | | | Dec 07 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|