Docket for 18-275
|
Aug 30 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 04 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 17 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018. | | | Nov 05 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|